EP1708031 - Multi-layer spectral purity filter, lithographic apparatus including such a spectral purity filter and device manufacturing method, and device manufactured thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/40] | Multi-layer spectral purity filter lithographic apparatus including such a spectral purity filter and device manufacturing method, and device manufactured thereby | ||
[2015/15] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands BV De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands BV 6501, De Run 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banine, Vadim Yevgenyevich Nierslaan 2 5704 NK Helmond / NL | 02 /
Moors, Johannes Hubertus Josephina Dierdonklaan 56 5709 MT Helmond / NL | 03 /
Sjmaenok, Leonid Aizikovitch Jos Francotteweg 6c 6291 GP Vaals / NL | 04 /
Salashchenko, Nikolay Nikolaevitch Prospekt 60-letiya Oktyabrya 1, apt.3 Nizhny Novgorod / RU | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Slenders, Petrus Johannes Waltherus, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Slenders, Petrus J. W., et al ASML Netherlands B.V Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/40] | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251514.3 | 22.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | US20050091923 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: US 91923 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1708031 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1708031 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G03F7/70916 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70191 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70291 (KR);
G03F7/70308 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70575 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70941 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/07] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiger spektraler Reinigungsfilter, lithografischer Apparat mit einem derartigen spektralen Reinigungsfilter, Herstellungsverfahren für eine Vorrichtung und auf diese Weise hergestellte Vorrichtung | [2006/40] | English: | Multi-layer spectral purity filter, lithographic apparatus including such a spectral purity filter and device manufacturing method, and device manufactured thereby | [2015/15] | French: | Filtre de pureté spectral multicouches, appareil lithographique comprenant un tel filtre de pureté spectral, procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif et dispositif fabriqué de la sorte | [2006/40] |
Former [2006/40] | Multi-layer spectral purity filter lithographic apparatus including such a spectral purity filter and device manufacturing method, and device manufactured thereby | Examination procedure | 05.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 07.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | EP08020593.3 / EP2053464 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1202117 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-23 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1331519 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-23* paragraph [0007] *; | [X]US2004061930 (WEDOWSKI MARCO [DE]) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015] * * figure 1 * | Examination | US2003058529 | by applicant | US2003058529 | US2004061930 |