EP1840964 - Semiconductor device with protected access [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irvine Sensors Corp. 3001 Redhill Avenue, Suite 3-108 Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozguz, Volkan H. 34 Lyon Ridge Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | 02 /
Leon, John 1033 South Sedona Lane Anaheim, CA 92808 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251821.2 | 31.03.2006 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840964 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/58, H01L25/065 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G11C5/04 (EP);
G06F21/87 (EP);
G11C7/24 (EP);
H01L23/57 (EP);
H01L25/0657 (EP);
H01L2224/16145 (EP);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
H01L2225/06548 (EP);
H01L2225/06551 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung mit Zugriffsschutz | [2007/40] | English: | Semiconductor device with protected access | [2007/40] | French: | Dispositif à semi-conducteur avec un accès protégé | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/43] | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0510433 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1,3,4,22 * column 3, line 26 - line 49 * * column 6, line 10 - line 33 *; | [Y]US5406630 (PIOSENKA GERALD V [US], et al) [Y] 5,9,10,16-18 * column 5, line 54 - line 58; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5824571 (ROLLENDER MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,22 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 23 * * column 3, line 40 - line 51 * * column 4, line 17 - line 33 * * column 4, line 58 - line 66 *; | [X]US5881155 (RIGAL VINCENT [FR]) [X] 1,3,22 * column 3, line 8 - line 13 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 6 *; | [Y]FR2798002 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [Y] 19,20 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 14 ** page 7, line 3 - line 16 *; | [XY]US2002104872 (DEFELICE RICHARD ALDEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,22 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] , [0031] , [0038] , [0039] , [0043] * [Y] 5,7,9,10,12,13,16-18; | [XY]US2004129939 (MATSUO MIE [JP], et al) [X] 6,8,11,14,15,21,22 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0032] - [0035]; figure 1 * [Y] 7,9,10,12,13,16-20 |