EP1758084 - Data driving circuit and driving method of light emitting display using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | For all designated states IUCF-HYU (Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University) Hanyang University, 17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu, Seoul / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
For all designated states IUCF-HYU (Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University) Hanyang University, 17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu, Seoul / KR | |||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-Do / KR | ||
For all designated states IUCF-HYU (Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University) Hanyang University, 17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu, Seoul / KR | |||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
For all designated states IUCF-HYU (Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University) Hanyang University, 17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu, Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryu, Do Hyung@Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Chung, Bo Yong @Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kwon, Oh Kyong @Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/46] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
Ryu, Do Hyung Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/09] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251830.3 | 31.03.2006 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | KR20050070433 | 01.08.2005 Original published format: KR 20050070433 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1758084 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1758084 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758084 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G3/3283 (EP,US);
G09G3/3291 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0852 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0289 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0223 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0276 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/46] |
Former [2008/18] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datentreiberschaltung und Verfahren zur Ansteuerung der lichtemittierenden Anzeige | [2007/09] | English: | Data driving circuit and driving method of light emitting display using the same | [2007/09] | French: | Circuit de commande de données et procédé de commande d'un panneau d'affichage émettant de la lumière | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 22.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1796070 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [E] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2005029456 (IGNIS INNOVATION INC [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,15 *; | [A]US2004104870 (MAMETSUKA KOJI [JP]) | [X] - HAI-JUNG IN ET AL, "A Novel Voltage-Programming Pixel with Current-Correction Method for Large-Size and High-Resolution AMOLEDs on Poly-Si Backplane", INTERNATIONAL MEETING ON INFORMATION DISPLAY, XX, XX, (20050723), no. 286, pages 901 - 904, XP002405123 [X] 1-41 * figure 3 * | Examination | WO2005069267 | - Anonymous, "MOS: Metal-Oxide-Silicon", (20010201), URL: http://ece-research.unm.edu/jimp/vlsi/slides/c1_basics.html, (20180326), XP055462665 | by applicant | WO2005069267 |