EP1843253 - Handheld electronic device and method for performing optimized spell checking during text entry by providing a sequentially ordered series of spell-check algorithms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | For all designated states 2012244 Ontario Inc. 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
For all designated states 2012244 Ontario Inc. 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fux, Vadim 532 Hallmark Drive Waterloo Ontario N2K 3P5 / CA | 02 /
Rubanovich, Dan 402 Laurel Gate Drive Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2S6 / CA | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251908.7 | 05.04.2006 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843253 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, G06F3/023 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G06F3/0237 (EP);
G06F40/232 (EP);
G06F40/274 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | 27.03.2008 | BA | 27.03.2008 | HR | 27.03.2008 | MK | 27.03.2008 | YU | 27.03.2008 | Title | German: | Tragbare elektronische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Durchführung von optimierter Rechtschreibprüfung während der Texteingabe mittels Bereitstellung einer sequenziell geordneten Reihe von Rechtschreibprüfungsalgorithmen | [2007/41] | English: | Handheld electronic device and method for performing optimized spell checking during text entry by providing a sequentially ordered series of spell-check algorithms | [2007/41] | French: | Dispositif électronique portatif et procédé pour effectuer la vérification orthographique optimisée durant l'entrée du texte en fournissant une série d'algorithmes de correcteurs orthographiques | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 18.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/34] | 03.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004155869 (ROBINSON B ALEX [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0111]; figures 1b,4c *; | [A]US2002196163 (BRADFORD ETHAN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002188448 (GOODMAN JOSHUA T [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |