EP1710857 - Method for manufacturing fuel cell stacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
FR
GB
LI
NL
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For:CH
DE
FR
GB
LI
NL
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/29] | For:CH
DE
FR
GB
LI
NL
General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2006/41] | For:CH
DE
FR
GB
LI
NL
The General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourgeois, Richard Scott 786 Myrtle Avenue Albany New York 12208 / US | 02 /
Gudlavalleti, Sauri 24 Stonehenge Lane Nr.21A Albany New York 12203 / US | 03 /
Shapiro, Andrew Philip 1086 Morningside Avenue Schenectady New York 12309 / US | 04 /
Hart, Richard Louis 4013 River Road Niskayuna New York 12309 / US | 05 /
Quek, Shu Ching 59 Sterling Heights Drive Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 06 /
Fan, Rong 28112 Ridgeforest Court Ranchos Palos Verdes California 90275 / US | 07 /
Weng, Dacong 28112 Ridgeforest Court Ranchos Palos Verdes California 90275 / US | 08 /
Qi, Xiwang 20820 Anza Avenue Nr.306 Torrance California 90503 / US | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
Bourgeois, Richard Scott 786 Myrtle Avenue Albany New York 12208 / US | ||
02 /
Gudlavalleti, Sauri 24 Stonehenge Lane Nr.21A Albany New York 12203 / US | |||
03 /
Shapiro, Andrew Philip 1086 Morningside Avenue Schenectady New York 12309 / US | |||
04 /
Hart, Richard Louis 9 Oxford Drive, Apt. 9 Latham New York 12110 / US | |||
05 /
Quek, Shu Ching 59 Sterling Heights Drive Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | |||
06 /
Fan, Rong 28112 Ridgeforest Court Ranchos Palos Verdes California 90275 / US | |||
07 /
Weng, Dacong 28112 Ridgeforest Court Ranchos Palos Verdes California 90275 / US | |||
08 /
Qi, Xiwang 20820 Anza Avenue Nr.306 Torrance California 90503 / US | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251921.0 | 05.04.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | US20050101697 | 07.04.2005 Original published format: US 101697 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1710857 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1710857 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/24, // H01M8/12 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
H01M8/0282 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/0271 (US);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M8/2404 (US);
H01M8/2425 (EP);
H01M8/2483 (US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/41] | H01M8/02, H01M8/24 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/33] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsvervahren für Brennstoffzellenstapel | [2006/41] | English: | Method for manufacturing fuel cell stacks | [2006/41] | French: | Méthode de construction d' un empilage de piles à combustible | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6656625 (THOMPSON CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, lines 4-15 * * column 6, lines 27-32 * * column 7, lines 10-18 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 5 *; | [X]US4857420 (MARICLE DONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 40 * * column 4, lines 20-27 * * column 5, lines 31-46 *; | [X]US2003096147 (BADDING MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] , [0040] , [0109] , [0110] , [0121] * |