EP1710676 - Network-attachable, file-accessible storage drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 1650 Technology Drive Suite 800 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbian, Douglas 1531 S. Owens Street No. 25 Lakewood, Colorado 80232 / US | 02 /
Chaney, Richard 448 Observation Drive Meridian, Idaho 83642 / US | 03 /
Guignard, Jean-Pierre 16 Impasse Saint Felix Toulouse 31400 / FR | 04 /
Moreira, Fernando 57 rue des Landes Plaisance Du Touch / FR | 05 /
Mulder, Curtis 5260 Holmes Place Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US | 06 /
Ostlund, Mark 2112 Tanager Court Pleasanton California 94566 / US | 07 /
Paulus, Franck 101 Avenue Lespinet Toulouse 31300 / FR | 08 /
Rabaud, Sebastien 9 chemin Nego Saoumos Toulouse 31300 / FR | 09 /
Hudson, Victor Wilmot 4426 N. County Road 17 Fort Colling Colorado 80524 / US | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Galloway, Peter David, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Galloway, Peter David, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251939.2 | 06.04.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | US20050669058P | 06.04.2005 Original published format: US 669058 P | US20050671950P | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 671950 P | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1710676 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1710676 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G06F3/06 (EP,US);
G06F3/0607 (EP,US);
G06F3/0661 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/17] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | An ein Netzwerk anschliessbares, dateizugängliches Speicherlaufwerk | [2006/41] | English: | Network-attachable, file-accessible storage drive | [2006/41] | French: | Lecteur de stockage connectable au réseau, avec accessibilité des fichiers | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2008 | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2009 | 30.04.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0630022 (IBM [US]) [X] 30-39 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 1 * * column 5, lines 23-32 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 53 * * column 8, lines 9,10 * * column 14, lines 12-23; figures 1-3 * [Y] 12,13; | [X]EP0721185 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 30-39 * column 4, lines 45-50 * * column 5, lines 6-16; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0862180 (SONY PRECISION TECHNOLOGY INC [JP]) [A] 1-29 * column 2, lines 12-29 * * column 8, line 5 - column 9, line 26 ** column 12, lines 17-56 *; | [Y]WO9840810 (STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 1 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, lines 23-26 * * page 18, line 7 - page 20, line 10 *; | [A]US2001024393 (KAWANO SHINICHI [JP]) [A] 5,6,18,22,23 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0021] , [0039] , [0040] , [0064]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]WO0195331 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 30-39 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 31; figures 3-6 *; | [XY]GB2371889 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,7-11,14-29 * page 1, lines 21-25 * * page 2, lines 18-21 * * page 3, lines 26-30 * * page 6, lines 19-27 * * page 12, line 26 - page 18, line 20 * * page 19, lines 19-23; figure 7 * [Y] 5,6,12,13; | [X] - GARY MUELLER ED - HEINZ STOCKINGER, "Jiro ?Management Applications", MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOGIES, 2001. MSS '01. EIGHTEENTH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20010401), ISBN 978-0-7695-9173-5, pages 349 - 349, XP031023324 [X] 1-3 * page 2, column LHC, lines 47-54 * |