EP1718035 - DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, REGISTRATION METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/44] | Data processing device, registration method and program | ||
[2016/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakou, Ritsuto, @c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Sakou, Ritsuto, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [2017/16] |
Former [2006/44] | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al ABEL & IMRAY, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252139.8 | 19.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050126371 | 25.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005126371 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1718035 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1718035 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1718035 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
H04L61/5076 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F15/00 (KR);
H04L61/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2012/38] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -VERFAHREN UND -PROGRAMM ZUR REGISTRIERUNG | [2016/50] | English: | DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, REGISTRATION METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2016/50] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME POUR ENREGISTREMENT | [2016/50] |
Former [2006/44] | Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung, -verfahren und -programm zur Registrierung | ||
Former [2006/44] | Data processing device, registration method and program | ||
Former [2006/44] | Appareil, procédé et programme pour enregistrement | Examination procedure | 18.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 12.07.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | FR | 19.06.2017 | GB | 19.07.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/21] | ES | 19.04.2017 | |
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
GB | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 19.04.2017 | |
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 19.04.2017 | |
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002152253 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [XA] - STAPP B VOLZ CISCO SYSTEMS M ET AL, "The DHCP Client FQDN Option; draft-ietf-dhc-fqdn-option-10.txt", 5. JCT-VC MEETING; 96. MPEG MEETING; 16-3-2011 - 23-3-2011; GENEVA;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JC TVC-SITE/- 17/03/2011, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, (20050215), vol. dhc, no. 10, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015038185 [X] 1-3,7-13 * Chapters 1-4. * [A] 4-6 | [A] - Paul Huck et al., A Self-Configuring and Self-Administering Name System with Dynamic Address Assignment, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, (20020201), pages 1 - 33, XP040131494 [A] 1-13 * Paragraph 5.4. * |