EP1717601 - Display of catheter tip with beam direction for ultrasound system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2009/41] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar California 91765 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altmann, Andres Claudio Shimshon 13/9 Haifa 34614 / IL | 02 /
Govari, Assaf Vitzo 1 Haifa 34400 / IL | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252217.2 | 25.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | US20050115013 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: US 115013 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717601 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717601 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717601 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/89, G01S7/52, G06T17/00, A61B8/12, A61B5/06, A61M25/00, A61B19/00, A61N7/00, A61B5/04, A61B5/042, A61B17/22, // A61M25/00, A61B19/00, A61N7/00, A61B5/04, A61B5/042, A61B17/22 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G06T19/00 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
A61B5/283 (EP,US);
A61B6/488 (EP,US);
A61B8/4416 (EP,US);
A61B8/4483 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/0035 (EP,US);
A61B5/0037 (EP,US);
A61B5/7285 (EP,US);
A61B5/743 (EP,US);
A61B6/503 (EP,US);
A61B6/504 (EP,US);
A61B6/5247 (EP,US);
A61B6/541 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/0883 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Anzeige einer Katheterspitze und Strahlrichtung für ein Ultraschallsystem | [2006/44] | English: | Display of catheter tip with beam direction for ultrasound system | [2006/44] | French: | Affichage d'une pointe de cathéter et la direction d'un faisceau ultrasonore pour système ultrasonographique | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.2009 | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | LT | 07.10.2009 | LV | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | IS | 07.02.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | IE | 25.04.2010 | LU | 25.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
LU | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
CY | 07.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
IE | 25.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 07.10.2009 | |
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9625881 (GROENNINGSAETER AAGE [NO], et al) [X] 1 * page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 21; figure 15 *; | [A]US6049622 (ROBB RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 9-11* the whole document *; | [X]US2003065265 (JACKSON JOHN I [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1354557 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003199748 (CAMUS ESTELLE [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003231789 (WILLIS N PARKER [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0092] , [0096] - [0098] *; | [X]EP1504721 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8,12 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1815797 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0043]; figure 20 * | by applicant | WO9625881 | US2003065265 | EP1354557 | US2003199748 | US2003231789 | EP1504721 | EP1815797 |