EP1731719 - Lubrication arrangement for bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Paul Alan 59 Kings Drive, Littleover Derby, DE23 6EX / GB | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252496.2 | 12.05.2006 | [2006/50] | Priority number, date | GB20050011788 | 10.06.2005 Original published format: GB 0511788 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731719 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1731719 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/18, F01M11/02, F16N21/00, F16N7/38 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
F01D25/18 (EP,US);
F16N17/02 (EP,US);
F01M11/02 (EP,US);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/34] |
Former [2006/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmiereinrichtung für Lager | [2006/50] | English: | Lubrication arrangement for bearings | [2006/50] | French: | Système de lubrification pour paliers | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000087718 ; | [A]GB2133481 (GEN MOTORS OVERSEAS) [A] 1-4,6-8,10 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 62 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3147821 (EGGENBERGER MARKUS A) [A] 1-7,10 * column 2, lines 23-36 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 20 * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000087718 A 20000328 (KOMATSU LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |