EP1741491 - Rotary knife for a cutting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Combicut Limited Foundation House Paddock Road Caversham Reading Berkshire RG4 5BY / GB | [2008/49] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Combicut Limited Foundation House Paddock Street Caversham Reading Berkshire RG4 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Jo-At Limited Wolsey Road Caversham Reading, Berkshire RG4 8BY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walters, Keith The Well House Shiplake Row Binfield Health Oxon RG9 4DR / GB | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252531.6 | 15.05.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | GB20050013706 | 04.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0513706 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741491 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741491 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/36 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B02C18/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Rotierendes Messer für eine Zerkleinerungsvorrichtung | [2007/02] | English: | Rotary knife for a cutting apparatus | [2007/02] | French: | Couteau rotatif pour hachoir | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2008 | BE | 05.11.2008 | CY | 05.11.2008 | EE | 05.11.2008 | FI | 05.11.2008 | IT | 05.11.2008 | LT | 05.11.2008 | LV | 05.11.2008 | RO | 05.11.2008 | SI | 05.11.2008 | SK | 05.11.2008 | TR | 05.11.2008 | BG | 05.02.2009 | SE | 05.02.2009 | GR | 06.02.2009 | IS | 05.03.2009 | PT | 06.04.2009 | HU | 06.05.2009 | IE | 15.05.2009 | LU | 15.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 15.05.2009 | ||
LU | 15.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.05.2009 | ||
LU | 15.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
LT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LV | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IS | 05.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 05.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE369018 (EUGEN ESSLEN) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3414375 (NAGEMA VEB K [DD]) [A] 1-23 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [XY]RU2184613 (ZAP JURIJ VIKTOROVICH) [X] 1-3,14-16,19-23 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 4-8; | [YA]FR2829710 (DAVID GUY ETS [FR]) [Y] 4-8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1,2 |