EP1724614 - Variable-focus lens and fabricating method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan-3-dong, Youngtong-ku Suwon, Kyungki-do / KR | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Byung Do 133-505 Joogong Apt. Yakdae-dong Wonmi-ku Boochun Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Chung, Sang Kug No. 202 Hyundai Apt. 575-25 Gongreung-1-dong Nowon-ku Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Young Gi 130-1101 Haniltown Jowon-dong Jangan-ku Suwon Kyungki-do / KR | 04 /
Bae, Jae Young, c/o Dept. of Chemistry Faculty of Natural Sciences, Keimyung University 1000 Sindang-dong, Dalseo-gu, Daegu 704- / KR | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252545.6 | 16.05.2006 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | KR20050040874 | 16.05.2005 Original published format: KR 20050040874 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724614 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724614 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/14 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
G02B26/005 (EP,US);
G02B3/14 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Title | German: | Variable Sammellinse und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2006/47] | English: | Variable-focus lens and fabricating method thereof | [2006/47] | French: | Objectif à focale variable et son procédé de fabrication | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | BE | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | CZ | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IT | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | LV | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | PL | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | SI | 20.08.2008 | SK | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | BG | 20.11.2008 | SE | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | ES | 01.12.2008 | IS | 20.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | HU | 21.02.2009 | IE | 16.05.2009 | LU | 16.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
HU | 21.02.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
LU | 16.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
LU | 16.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
PL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 16.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
LV | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2002162506 ; | [DA]WO03069380 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP1345055 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-5* abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002162506 A 20020607 (CANON INC) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * [A] 4 |