EP1724512 - Tapping tee [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB Industrivägen 513 81 Fristad / SE | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muckle, Derek John 16 Turvey Lane Long Whalton Leicester LE12 5DN / GB | 02 /
Street, Ronald Arthur 24 Braodway Duffield Belper Derby DE56 4BT / GB | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252600.9 | 18.05.2006 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | GB20050010131 | 18.05.2005 Original published format: GB 0510131 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724512 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/28, F16L47/03, F16L25/14 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F16L47/34 (EP);
F16L41/084 (EP);
F16L47/03 (EP);
F16L47/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anbohren einer Leitung | [2006/47] | English: | Tapping tee | [2006/47] | French: | Appareil pour le piquage d'un conduit | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1408844 (ROLLMAPLAST AG) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 13; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]DE2929978 (PFEIFFER OHLER EISEN THEOB) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1584365 (WAVIN BV) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003136445 (SICHLER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]JPH0942566 ; | [A]US4810008 (BRODIE SCOTT [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 41 - line 59; figure 6 *; | [A]DE2353481 (STREUBER SULO EISENWERK F) [A] 1 * page 4 - page 5; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2824571 (SONABAT CHANTAL [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09042566 A 19970214 (NAKAHARA JUSHI KOGYO KK; UEHARA TETSUO) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4933037 | US4806181 | US5104468 | GB2310264 |