EP1728824 - Evoh composite resin and refrigerant transporting hose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunoda, Katsuhiko c/o Yokohama P. Bridgestone C. 1, Kashio-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2009/51] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
Tsunoda, Karsuhiko c/o Yokohama P. Bridgestone C. 1, Kashio-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252642.1 | 19.05.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | JP20050159674 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005159674 | JP20050340546 | 25.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005340546 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1728824 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1728824 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1728824 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1728824 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L29/04, C08L23/08, F16L11/04 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L23/00 (EP);
C08L53/025 (EP);
C08L9/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L29/04, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/08 (EP);
C08L29/04, C08L2666/24 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/15] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EVOH-Verbundharz und Kühlmittelschlauch | [2006/49] | English: | Evoh composite resin and refrigerant transporting hose | [2006/49] | French: | Résine composite à base d'EVOH et tuyau pour réfrigérant | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5223571 (IGARASHI ICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0703279 (BUNA SOW LEUNA OLEFINVERB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * example - * * claim 2 * * page 10, lines 21-37 *; | [X]US6294609 (BERTIN DENIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5160475 (ASANO KUNIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]EP1176168 (RIKEN VINYL IND [JP]) [X] 1-8 * example -; claims 1,6 * * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] *; | [X]EP0814126 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * claim - * | by applicant | JP2000120944 | JP2004104947 | JP2004299025 |