EP1727043 - Dynamic mapping of shared libraries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stone, Peter P.O. Box 7599 Loveland, CO 80537-0599 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252727.0 | 25.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20050137526 | 25.05.2005 Original published format: US 137526 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1727043 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1727043 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F9/44 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G06F8/71 (EP,US);
G06F9/44521 (EP,US);
G06F9/44552 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/48] | G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/32] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Abbildung gemeinsamer Bibliotheken | [2006/48] | English: | Dynamic mapping of shared libraries | [2006/48] | French: | Cartographie dynamique de bibliothèques partagées | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002133805 (PUGH WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] *; | [X]US6185734 (SABOFF MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * column 2, line 41 - line 64 * * column 3, line 8 - line 61 *; | [X]US2002100017 (GRIER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081] *; | [A] - FRANK BUSCHMANN, REGINE MEUNIER, HANS ROHNERT, PETER SOMMERLAD, MICHAEL STAL, Pattern-Opriented Software Architecture: A System of Patterns, Volume 1, BAFFINS LANE, CHICHESTER, WEST SUSSEX PO19 1UD, ENGLAND, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD,, (199610), XP002454785 [A] 1-26 * page 264, whole page * * page 274, last paragraph * |