EP1860126 - Polyolefin powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Manufacturing Belgium NV Scheldelaan 482 2040 Antwerpen / BE | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey, KT16 8LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252749.4 | 26.05.2006 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860126 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F2/00, C08F6/04 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (KR);
C08F2/00 (KR);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F6/04 (KR);
C08J3/12 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6555 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/07, C08F2500/24 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/07, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/24, C08F2500/05 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | GB [2008/32] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polyolefinpulver | [2007/48] | English: | Polyolefin powder | [2007/48] | French: | Poudre polyoléfinique | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/32] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2008/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0144313 (SAMSUNG GENERAL CHEMICALS LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [DA]WO2005021610 (SOLVAY [BE], et al) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2005032714 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2005082962 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006020623 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |