EP1726811 - System and method for cooling lateral edge regions of a divergent seal of an axisymmetric nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cowan, Curtis 6 Steeple View Drive East Hampton Connecticut 06424 / US | 02 /
Paul, Stephen A. 24 Oak Farms Road Andover Connecticut 06232 / US | 03 /
Harris, Meggan 83 Dara Drive Colchester Connecticut 06415 / US | 04 /
Attridge, Paul 100 Kennedy Drive Colchester Connecticut 06415 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Adam David, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Taylor, Adam David, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/26] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/48] | Samuels, Adrian James Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252768.4 | 26.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20050140667 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 140667 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1726811 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1726811 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726811 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/12, F02K1/80, F02K1/82 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
F02K1/1223 (EP,US);
F02K1/805 (EP,US);
F02K1/822 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
F05D2260/205 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/08] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlung der Klappen einer verstellbaren Schubdüse | [2006/48] | English: | System and method for cooling lateral edge regions of a divergent seal of an axisymmetric nozzle | [2006/48] | French: | Refroidissement des volets d'une tuyère de poussée | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.05.2013 | [2014/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5775589 (VDOVIAK JOHN WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1,1a,3a,3b,4a * * column 2, line 65 - line 2 * * column 4, line 11 - line 59 * * column 5, line 48 - line 65 * * column 6, line 25 - line 41 *; | [Y]EP1378651 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 4, line 30 - line 32 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0016] , [0017] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2005060984 (PROUTEAU JACKIE [FR], et al) [A] 1,3 * figures 2,4 * |