EP1862658 - Controller and control method for an engine control unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies Holding S.à.r.l. Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | [2010/12] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casarella, Mark 5518 Amber Way Ypsilanti, Michigan 48197 / US | 02 /
Nilsson, Andreas 122 Abbeyfields Close London, NW10 7EG / GB | 03 /
Jonsson, David Coach House Cottage, Moor Common, Lane End High Wycombe, HP14 3HT / GB | 04 /
Fallahi, Abdolreza 58 Rowland Avenue Pinner, Middlesex, HA5 4BP / GB | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Gregory, John David Charles, et al Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Gregory, John David Charles, et al Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | Hopley, Joanne Selina, et al Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252794.0 | 30.05.2006 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862658 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1862658 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22, F02D41/14, F02M65/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D41/221 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | Regler und Regelverfahren für ein Motorsteuergerät | [2007/49] | English: | Controller and control method for an engine control unit | [2007/49] | French: | Régulateur et procédé de régulation pour un dipositif de commande d'un moteur | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IT | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | IE | 30.05.2011 | LU | 30.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GB | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.05.2011 | ||
LU | 30.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.05.2011 | ||
LU | 30.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.05.2011 | ||
LU | 30.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 30.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19540826 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,15-17,20-23 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 43 * [A] 2-14,18,19; | [A]DE19626690 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - line 35 * * page 3, column 33 - page 4, column 9 *; | [A]DE19813494 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1-23 * abstract ** column 1, line 25 - line 63 * |