EP1728970 - Turbine blade cooling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Downs, James P. 325 Leeward Drive Jupiter, Florida 33477 / US | 02 /
Roeloffs, Norman F. 23 Tradewinds Circle Tequesta, Florida 33469 / US | 03 /
Pietraszkiewicz, Edward 1094 Pleasant Street Southington, Connecticut 06489 / US | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/49] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06252809.6 | 31.05.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | US20050140786 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: US 140786 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1728970 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1728970 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1728970 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2250/711 (EP,US);
F05D2250/712 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/33] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlsystem für Turbinenschaufel | [2006/49] | English: | Turbine blade cooling system | [2006/49] | French: | Système de refroidissement d'une aube de turbine | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2260166 (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) [X] 1-13 * figure 4 *; | [X]EP0475658 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-13 * figure 4 *; | [X]US5702232 (MOORE ROBERT P [US]) [X] 1-7,13 * figures 3,5 *; | [X]US2004219017 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-2,5-7,13 * figures 2,5 *; | [X]EP0896127 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,5-7 * paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [X]US6206638 (GLYNN CHRISTOPHER C [US], et al) [X] 1,5-6 * figure 4 *; | [X]US5464322 (CUNHA FRANCISCO J [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 5 *; | [X]US5246340 (WINSTANLEY DAVID K [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 5 *; | [X]US5370499 (LEE CHING-PANG [US]) [X] 8-11 * figure 2 *; | [X]GB2184492 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 8,10-12 * figure 2 *; | [X]US3844678 (STERMAN A, et al) [X] 8-10 * figure 4 *; | [X]EP1035302 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 8,10-11 * figures 2,3,5 * | by applicant | GB2260166 | EP0475658 | US5702232 | US2004219017 | EP0896127 | US6206638 | US5464322 | US5246340 |