EP1739833 - Semiconductor device having an integrated, self-regulated PWM current and power limiter and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 750 Canyon Drive, Suite 300 Coppell, TX 75019 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burlak, Gary J. 713 Fairledge Avenue Lake Orion Oakland County, Michigan 48362 / US | 02 /
Mirowski, Marian 6019 Cheryl Court West Bloomfield Oakland Country, Michigan 48324 / US | [2015/46] |
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
Burlak, Gary J. 713 Fairledge Avenue Lake Orion Oakland County, Michigan 48362 / US | ||
02 /
Mirowski, Marian 6019 Cheryl Court West Bloomfield Oakland Country, Michigan 48324 / US | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253188.4 | 20.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | US20050172515 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 172515 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1739833 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1739833 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739833 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03K7/08, H03K17/18, H03K17/082 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H03K17/18 (EP,US);
H02J1/00 (EP,US);
H02M1/0012 (EP,US);
H02M3/157 (EP,US);
H03K2017/0806 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/01] | H03K7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/46] |
Former [2010/27] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung mit integriertem selbstreguliertem PWM-Strom, Leistungsbegrenzer und Verfahren | [2007/01] | English: | Semiconductor device having an integrated, self-regulated PWM current and power limiter and method | [2007/01] | French: | Dispositif à semi-conducteur avec un courant PWM intégré autorégulé, limiteur de puissance et procédé | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.11.2015 | GB | 20.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | [2017/26] |
Former [2016/21] | IT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5293077 (SEKI KUNIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,15-17,19 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-7,13,18 [I] 8,14; | [Y]EP1357461 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORP [US]) [Y] 5-7,13,18* figures 1, 4a, 4b * | Examination | US4924112 | EP0792008 | US5923135 | US6060792 | US2002039269 | US2004124808 | by applicant | US5293077 | EP1357461 |