EP1837754 - Processing method and computer system for summation of floating point data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inagaki, Junichi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Koyabu, Masao c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Ishihata, Hiroaki c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253422.7 | 29.06.2006 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | JP20060080535 | 23.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006080535 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1837754 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1837754 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/485, G06F7/509, // G06F7/499 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
G06F7/485 (EP,US);
G06F7/00 (KR);
G06F7/509 (EP,US);
G06F7/49942 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | G06F7/485, G06F7/499 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/24] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verarbeitungsverfahren und Computersystem zur Summierung von Gleitkommadaten | [2007/39] | English: | Processing method and computer system for summation of floating point data | [2007/39] | French: | Procédé de traitement et système informatique de sommation de données à point flottant | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 02.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2013 | 06.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/05] | 28.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/05] | Appeal following examination | 16.02.2015 | Appeal received No. T1036/15 | 21.04.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4054787 (POS NORMAN D) [X] 1,6,11,16,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 53 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US5117384 (DREHMEL ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,16,17 * abstract * * column 6, line 50 - column 9, line 15 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5359548 (YOSHIZAWA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 12 *; | [A]WO02069177 (BHANOT GYAN V [US], et al) [A] 6,11,16 * abstract * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2003154227 (HOWARD JASON M [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11,16,17 * abstract * * figures 3,7-9 * | Examination | US2002184285 |