EP1742466 - Image display device and recording medium reproducing apparatus and recording medium reproducing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Hyung Chan 502, Gyeongin Dream Villa, 1542-47 Jooan4-dong Nam-gu, Incheon-si / KR | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253490.4 | 03.07.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | KR20050059397 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: KR 20050059397 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742466 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1742466 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N5/445 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
H04N5/44 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4135 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/44] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildanzeigevorrichtung, Wiedergabevorrichtung für ein Aufzeichnungsmedium und Wiedergabeverfahren für ein Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2007/02] | English: | Image display device and recording medium reproducing apparatus and recording medium reproducing method | [2007/02] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'images, appareil de reproduction d'un support d'enregistrement et procédé de reproduction d'un support d'enregistrement | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 06.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/04] | 20.12.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2012 | 18.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0141144 (OPENGLOBE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7-10,12 * page 11, lines 15,16 * * figure 1 * * page 14, lines 10-13 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3,4,6,11; | [X]EP1021005 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 5 * claim 2 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]GB2341298 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,11 * abstract *; | [A]US6665020 (STAHL THOMAS ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002122069 (KO KYUNG-PILL [KR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002140863 (PARK IL SEONG [KR]) [A] 3-6 * the whole document *; | [PA]JP2005241393 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [PA]US2005149973 (FANG HENRY Y [US]) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Language identification in teletext transmissions", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (19941201), vol. 368, no. 53, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007120131 [Y] 3,6 * the whole document * |