EP1760138 - Modified copolymer containing lubricating oil additive composition and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/10] | A lubricating oil additive composition and method of making the same | ||
[2011/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stokes, Casey D. 1143 7th Street Novato, CA 94945 / US | 02 /
Van Dam, Willem 15 Palomino Circle Novato, CA 94947 / US | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/10] | Nash, David Allan HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253813.7 | 20.07.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | US20050218182 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: US 218182 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760138 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760138 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1760138 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10M163/00, // C10N20/04, C10N30/04, C10N40/25, C10N60/14 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
C10M163/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/024 (EP,US);
C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2205/028 (EP,US);
C10M2207/022 (EP,US);
C10M2207/027 (EP,US);
C10M2209/04 (EP,US);
C10M2209/082 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2209/086 (EP,US);
C10M2209/103 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/06 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/066 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2217/022 (EP,US);
C10M2217/024 (EP,US);
C10M2217/028 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2219/08 (EP,US);
C10M2219/10 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/041 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2060/06 (EP,US);
C10N2060/09 (EP,US);
C10N2060/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2215/28, C10N2060/06 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28, C10N2060/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/14] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmierölzusatzstoffzusammensetzung enthaltend ein modifiziertes Copolymer und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2011/14] | English: | Modified copolymer containing lubricating oil additive composition and method of making the same | [2011/14] | French: | Composition des additifs pour huile lubrifiante contenant un copolymère modifié et son procédé de fabrication | [2011/14] |
Former [2007/10] | Schmieröladditivzusammensetzung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | ||
Former [2007/10] | A lubricating oil additive composition and method of making the same | ||
Former [2007/10] | Composition d'additifs pour huile lubrifiante et procédé pour la préparer | Examination procedure | 19.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 24.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9507944 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-47 * claims 1-9; table 2 *; | [A]EP0776963 (CHEVRON CHEM CO [US]) [A] 1-47 * claims 1-24; table III *; | [A]EP0985725 (CHEVRON CHEM CO [US]) [A] 1-47 * examples 1-41; claims 1,16; tables 6,7 *; | [A]US6358892 (HARRISON JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-47* examples A,B,1EC; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1316564 (CHEVRON ORONITE CO [US]) [Y] 1-47 * paragraphs [0099] - [0108]; examples 8-16 * |