EP1830279 - Network interface controlling lock operation and method of operating the network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Beom Hak No. 401, 414-3, Mangwon-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-230 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Eui Seok No. 207-701, Samsung Apt. Yuljeon-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-705 / KR | 03 /
Rhim, Sang Woo No. 101-1003, Doosan Weve Apt., 252-1 Nonhyeon-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-010 / KR | [2009/26] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
Lee, Beom Hak No. 401, 414-3, Mangwon-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-230 / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Eui Seok NO. 207-701, Samsung Apt. Yuljeon-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-705 / KR | |||
03 /
Rhim, Sang Woo 101-1003, Doosan Weve Apt., 252-1 Nonhyeon-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-010 / KR | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253821.0 | 20.07.2006 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | KR20050127558 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050127558 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830279 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1830279 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1830279 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F13/38 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP,US);
G06F13/38 (KR);
H04L2012/5603 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | G06F13/38 | Designated contracting states | GB [2008/34] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzwerkschnittstelle zur Verriegelungsoperationssteuerung und Verfahren dafür | [2007/36] | English: | Network interface controlling lock operation and method of operating the network | [2007/36] | French: | Interface de réseau pour commander une opération de verrouillage et méthode associée | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005103934 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 3 - line 11 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 27 *; | [A] - ARM LIMITED, "PrimeCell® AXI Configurable Interconnect (PL300)", TECHNICAL REFERENCE MANUAL, (20051026), pages I - 2-13, URL: http://infocenter.arm.com/help/topic/com.arm.doc.ddi0354b/DDI0354.pdf, (20071008), XP002454110 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [2.1.6] * | [A] - ARM, "AMBA AXI PROTOCOL V1.0 SPECIFICATION", INTERNET CITATION, (2003), URL: http://www.arm.com/products/solutions/axi_spec.html, (20050824), XP002342105 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |