EP1881717 - Allocating channels in multi-user or multi-service real-time transmissions of wireless packet data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
GB
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | For:DE
Lucent Technologies Network Systems GmbH Thurn-und-Taxis-Strasse 10 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For:FR
GB
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
For:DE
Lucent Technologies Network Systems GmbH Thurn-und-Taxis-Strasse 10 90411 Nürnberg / DE | |||
Former [2009/03] | For:FR
GB
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
For:DE
Lucent Technologies Network Systems GmbH Thurn-und-Taxis-Strasse 10 90411 Nürnberg / DE | |||
Former [2008/04] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | ||
For:DE
Lucent Technologies Network Systems GmbH Thurn-und-Taxis-Strasse 10 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dekorsky, Armin Feldgasse 36 90489 Nuremberg / DE | 02 /
Singh, Amanpreet H.-H- Meier-Allee 21 28213 Bremen / DE | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2008/04] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253849.1 | 25.07.2006 | [2008/04] | Priority number, date | EP20060253848 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06253848 | US20060458707 | 20.07.2006 Original published format: US 458707 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881717 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881717 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
H04W28/22 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | H04Q7/36, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zuweisung von Kanälen bei Multi-User- oder Multi-Service-Echtzeitübertragungen von drahtlosen Packetdaten | [2008/04] | English: | Allocating channels in multi-user or multi-service real-time transmissions of wireless packet data | [2008/04] | French: | Allocation de canaux pour la transmission sans fil de paquets de données en temps réel dans un contexte multi-utilisateur ou à multi-services | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2006 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006056451 (YANO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0078] * * claim 1 * [A] 5-10; | [A]US2006013168 (AGRAWAL AVNEESH [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * | [X] - CHEONG YUI WONG ET AL, "Multiuser OFDM with Adaptive Subcarrier, Bit, and Power Allocation", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (199910), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 0733-8716, XP011055027 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1747, column L, line 23 - page 2, column L, line 5 * * page 1752, column L, line 43 - column R, line 56 * * figure 2 * |