EP1749962 - Method and apparatus for forming slats for fabric in coverings for architectural openings and the slats formed thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INC. 2 Park Way Upper Saddle River New Jersey 07458 / US | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jelic, Ralph G. 1602 Pika Road Boulder Colorado 80302 / US | 02 /
Teter, William L. 7996 Bradburn Blvd. B Westminster Colorado 80030 / US | 03 /
Swiszcz, Paul G. 7542 Estate Circle Niwot Colorado 80503 / US | 04 /
Dann, Kevin M. 746 Trenton Street Denver Colorado 80230 / US | 05 /
Carroll, Steven J. 18910 East Kent Circle Aurora Colorado 80013 / US | 06 /
Sevcik, Thomas E. 7001 Weld County Road 21 Fort Lupton Colorado 80621 / US | 07 /
Wisecup, Stephen T. 71389 Washburn Street Erie Colorado 80516 / US | 08 /
Siebenaller, Michael J. 13971 Silverton Drive Broomfield Colorado 80020 / US | 09 /
Smith, Bruce R. 7251 Floyd Highway North Copper Hill Virginian 24079 / US | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06253889.7 | 25.07.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | US20050702794P | 26.07.2005 Original published format: US 702794 P | US20060459529 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: US 459529 | US20060459536 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: US 459536 | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/06] | US20050702794P | 26.07.2005 | |
US20060459529 | 24.07.2006 | ||
US20060459536 | 24.07.2006 | ||
US20060459540 | 24.07.2006 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1749962 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1749962 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1749962 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/266, E06B9/386 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
E06B9/386 (EP);
B29C53/04 (EP);
E06B9/266 (EP);
B29K2105/12 (EP);
B29L2031/7192 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Latten für Stoffüberdeckung als Überzüge für architektonische Öffnungen und dadurch hergestellte Latten | [2007/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for forming slats for fabric in coverings for architectural openings and the slats formed thereby | [2007/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de lamelles de renfort à tissus pour recouvrir des ouvertures architectoniques et lamelles produites par lesdits procédé et dispositif | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 24.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IT | 03.12.2008 | LT | 03.12.2008 | LV | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | IS | 03.04.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | IE | 25.07.2009 | LU | 25.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
IE | 25.07.2009 | ||
LU | 25.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 25.07.2009 | ||
LU | 25.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 25.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 25.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 25.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 03.12.2008 | |
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3006031 (LEON FRIEDMAN JAY) [A] 1-20 * figures 3,7 *; | [A]US2003215633 (MORRIS STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 21-31 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] * |