EP1752690 - Liquid flow control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states John Guest International Limited Horton Road West Drayton Middlesex UB7 8JL / GB | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guest, John Derek Iona Canon Hill Way Bray Berkshire SL6 2EX / GB | 02 /
Guest, Timothy Stephen Heathfield Canon Hill Drive Bray Berkshire SL6 2EU / GB | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254087.7 | 03.08.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | GB20050016530 | 11.08.2005 Original published format: GB 0516530 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752690 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1752690 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/00 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
F16K31/001 (EP,KR,US);
A01G25/02 (KR);
A01G25/16 (KR);
Y10T137/1866 (EP,US);
Y10T137/189 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Steuerung des Durchflusses einer Flüssigkeit | [2007/07] | English: | Liquid flow control device | [2007/07] | French: | Dispositif de régulation d'écoulement de liquide | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | LT | 28.05.2008 | LV | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | PL | 28.05.2008 | RO | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | IE | 03.08.2008 | LU | 03.08.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | IS | 28.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | HU | 29.11.2008 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
TR | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 03.08.2008 | ||
LU | 03.08.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 03.08.2008 | ||
LU | 03.08.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 03.08.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 03.08.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LT | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IS | 28.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
LV | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB797791 (ALEXANDER OSMOND CHAMPION) [A] 1,6* page 2, lines 40-129; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US3750688 (DERBY R, et al) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0424749 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7 * column 3, lines 2-40; figure . *; | [X]US5382270 (GRAHAM NEIL B [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 46; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19812436 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 7; figures 7,8 * |