EP1752754 - Method and apparatus for signal signature analysis for event detection in rotating machinery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/48] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iyer, Naresh Sundaram 168D Eastwood Drive Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 02 /
Aragones, James Kenneth 17 Spruce Street Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 03 /
Yan, Weizhong 3 Hampshire Place Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 04 /
Hatch, Charles Terrance 1525 Mill Creek Way Gardnerville, NV 89410 / US | 05 /
Hershey, John Erik 4 Vines Road Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US | 06 /
Goebel, Kai Frank 122 Lake Road Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US | 07 /
Bonissone, Piero Patrone 1065 Avon Road Schenectady, New York 12308 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254135.4 | 07.08.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | US20050200156 | 10.08.2005 Original published format: US 200156 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1752754 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1752754 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1752754 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01M15/12 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
G01M15/12 (EP,US);
G01H17/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Signalsignaturanalyse zur Ereigniserkennung bei einer rotierenden Maschine | [2007/07] | English: | Method and apparatus for signal signature analysis for event detection in rotating machinery | [2007/07] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'analyse de la signature d'un signal pour la détection d'un événement dans une machine rotative | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2006 | AT | 28.11.2012 | BE | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | IT | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | NL | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | ES | 11.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | GB | 07.08.2013 | IE | 07.08.2013 | LU | 07.08.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 07.08.2006 | |
AT | 28.11.2012 | ||
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
GB | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
LU | 07.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
GB | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
GB | 07.08.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4078434 (WEBERHOFER JOSEF) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 17 - line 44 * * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 42 *; | [A]US4352293 (KURIHARA NOBUO, et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * column 2, line 8 - line 64 ** column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 58 *; | [A]EP0632261 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - line 50 * * column 5, line 45 - column 9, line 58 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP1004867 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-2,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]US6289735 (DISTER CARL J [US], et al) [A] 1-2,8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 5 - line 52 * * column 5, line 13 - column 10, line 28 *; | [I]WO2005005174 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4 - page 19 * * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | EP0632261 | WO2005005174 |