EP1801728 - Method of determining failure of an RFID label reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 3097 Satellite Blvd. Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2010/13] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states NRC International Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crooks, John Fredrick 4808 Riverview Way Duluth Georgia 30097 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | MacLeod, Roderick William, et al NCR Limited Architecture & Technology Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee DD2 4SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | MacLeod, Roderick William, et al NCR Limited Architecture & Technology Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee DD2 4SW / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR International, Inc., 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254171.9 | 08.08.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | US20050265809 | 03.11.2005 Original published format: US 265809 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801728 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801728 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06K7/0095 (EP,US);
G06K7/10336 (EP,US);
G06K7/10465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/10] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Feststellung von Defekten bei einem RFID-Etikett-Lesegerät | [2007/26] | English: | Method of determining failure of an RFID label reader | [2007/26] | French: | Procédé de détermination de la défaillance d'un lecteur d'étiquette RFID | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1515261 (ASCOM [FR]) [X] 1-6,10-13,18,20 * column 4, line 9 - line 14 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [X]FR2776444 (INNOVATRON ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-6,10-13,18,20 * page 8, line 15 - line 18 *; | [X]EP0759597 (AES PRODATA [BE]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * |