EP1762701 - Skewed tip hole turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2014/18] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ching-Pang 12 Camargo Pines Lane Cincinnati, OH 45243 / US | 02 /
Palmer, Nicholas Charles 739 Evergreen Place Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 03 /
Kirkeng, Kevin Lee 6007 Wildridge Lane Milford, OH 45150 / US | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254335.0 | 17.08.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | US20050211391 | 25.08.2005 Original published format: US 211391 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1762701 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1762701 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1762701 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/08, F01D5/20 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F05D2240/307 (EP,US);
F05D2250/292 (EP,US);
F05D2250/38 (EP,US);
F05D2260/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | F01D5/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2013/26] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbinenschaufel mit schiefer Spitzenöffnung | [2007/11] | English: | Skewed tip hole turbine blade | [2007/11] | French: | Aube de turbine avec trou d'extrémité oblique | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 18.04.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1281837 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * figures 6a,6b *; | [XA]EP1422383 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 2a,2b,3a * [A] 2-9; | [E]EP1736636 (SNECMA [FR]) [E] 1-3* figure 3 * |