EP1760342 - Linear motion guide unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Thompson Co., Ltd. 19-19, Takanawa 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwabara, Hideki 916 Gokurakuji Mino-shi, Gifu-ken 501-3763 / JP | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254360.8 | 18.08.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | JP20050257343 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005257343 | JP20060193729 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006193729 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760342 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760342 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1760342 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/06, F16C33/66 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
F16C33/6648 (EP,US);
F16C29/0609 (EP,US);
F16C29/065 (EP,US);
F16C33/6611 (US);
F16C2300/02 (EP,US);
F16C33/6655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2009/19] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Linearführungseinheit | [2007/10] | English: | Linear motion guide unit | [2007/10] | French: | Unité de guidage linéaire | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 28.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US6024490 (SHIRAI TAKEKI [JP]) [DA] 1,3,4,7-11 * figures 7,8 * * column 7, line 14 - column 8, line 15 *; | [A]US6203199 (PFEUFFER VIKTOR [DE]) [A] 1-4,7,11 * figure 10 * * column 20, line 63 - column 22, line 4 *; | [DA]JPH0571443U (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [DA] 1,4,9-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0905395 (NIPPON THOMPSON CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-4,9-11 * paragraph [0045] * * figure - *; | [DAP]EP1645763 (NIPPON THOMPSON CO LTD [JP]) [DAP] 1,2,5,6,11 * paragraph [0042] * * figure - *; | [A]DE4424795 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 4 * * figures 1,2,4,11 * | by applicant | JPH1193952 | JPH1122726 | JPH0571443U | JP2006105310 |