EP1770273 - Multi-cylinder engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hataura, Kiyoshi, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Manabu, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Takii, Osamu, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Kamiyama, Mitsuru, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Murata, Mutsumi, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Mikumo, Hiroshi, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 07 /
Nakamura, Yasushi c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | 08 /
Oyajima, Toshinori 1441-10, Fujioka Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2014/27] |
Former [2007/14] | 01 /
Hataura, Kiyoshi, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi, Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Miyazaki, Manabu, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi, Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Takii, Osamu, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi, Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
04 /
Kamiyama, Mitsuru, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi, Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
05 /
Murata, Mutsumi, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi, Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
06 /
Mikumo, Hiroshi, c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi, Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
07 /
Nakamura, Yasushi c/o Kubota Corporation 3-8, Chikko Shinmachi, Nishi-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
08 /
Oyajima, Toshinori 1441-10, Fujioka Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2014/26] |
Former [2007/14] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254685.8 | 08.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | JP20050281755 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005281755 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1770273 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1770273 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1770273 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1770273 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02M53/00, F02M55/02, F02M25/07, F01M11/03 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
F02M55/025 (EP,US);
F02F1/24 (KR);
F02B77/00 (KR);
F02M26/31 (EP,US);
F02M39/00 (EP,US);
F02M53/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/14] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrzylinder-Brennkraftmaschine | [2007/14] | English: | Multi-cylinder engine | [2007/14] | French: | Moteur multicylindre | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 24.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.08.2011
Deutz AKtiengesellschaft Abt. FR-P, Patente und Marken 51057 Köln / DE | [2011/38] | 22.09.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.10.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.05.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5927254 (INO MASAO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO0042314 (VOLVO AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 24 * * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]JP2001227407 (NISSAN MOTOR) [DA] 1 * abstract * * figure - * | by applicant | JP2001227407 |