EP1764091 - Improvements in or relating to amphoteric liposomes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marina Biotech, Inc. 3830 Monte Villa Parkway Bothell WA 98021-7266 / US | [2017/35] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Marina Biotech, Inc. 3830 Monte Villa Parkway Bothell WA 98021-7266 / US | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states novosom AG Weinbergweg 22 06120 Halle / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Panzner, Steffen Herweghstrasse 7 06114 Halle / DE | 02 /
Kerwitz, Yvonne Stolberger Strasse 71 99734 Nordhausen / DE | 03 /
Rauchhaus, Una Schleiermacherstrasse 12 06114 Halle / DE | 04 /
Lutz, Silke Schleiermacherstrasse 33 06114 Halle / DE | 05 /
Endert, Gerold Seebener Strasse 20 06114 Halle / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
Panzner, Steffen Herwehstrasse 7 06114 Halle / DE | ||
02 /
Kerwitz, Yvonne Stolberger Strasse 71 99734 Nordhausen / DE | |||
03 /
Rauchhaus, Una Schleiermacherstrasse 12 06114 Halle / DE | |||
04 /
Lutz, Silke Schleiermacherstrasse 33 06114 Halle / DE | |||
05 /
Endert, Gerold Seebener Strasse 20 06114 Halle / DE | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/40] | Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/48] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/12] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254821.9 | 15.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | US20050717291P | 15.09.2005 Original published format: US 717291 P | EP20050020216 | 15.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05020216 | EP20060113784 | 10.05.2006 Original published format: EP 06113784 | US20050267423 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 267423 | US20050266999 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 266999 | WO2005EP11905 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: PCT/EP2005/011905 | WO2005EP11908 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: PCT/EP2005/011908 | US20050717293P | 15.09.2005 Original published format: US 717293 P | EP20050020218 | 15.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05020218 | US20050717199P | 15.09.2005 Original published format: US 717199 P | EP20050020217 | 15.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05020217 | EP20050090322 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: EP 05090322 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764091 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764091 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764091 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61P1/00, A61P1/04, A61P3/10, A61P5/16, A61P11/06, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P25/00, A61P37/06 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
A61K47/16 (KR);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP);
C12N15/1138 (US);
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbesserungen für, oder in Bezug auf amphotere Liposomen | [2007/12] | English: | Improvements in or relating to amphoteric liposomes | [2007/12] | French: | Améliorations sur ou concernant des liposomes amphotères | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 14.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2006 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | IE | 15.09.2017 | LU | 15.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 15.09.2006 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.09.2006 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.09.2006 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
IE | 15.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
LU | 15.09.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0795325 (APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY INST [JP]) [X] 1-5,8 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 16 * * column 3, lines 9-25 * * column 4, lines 6-30 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO9849350 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 21, paragraph 4 - page 22, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US5834012 (PEREZ-SOLER ROMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 14, lines 11-18 * * column 15, lines 25-28 *; | [X]WO0021370 (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-17,23-39,41-47,50-55 * page 28, line 3 - page 29, line 12 * * page 68 - page 70; examples 7,8 *; | [X]WO0059474 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-17,23-39,41-46 * page 41 - page 42; example 7 *; | [X]WO02066013 (OPPERBAS HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 12 * * page 12, lines 23-25 *; | [DA]WO02066012 (NOVOSOM AG [DE], et al)[DA] 1-55; | [A]US2003099697 (PANZNER STEFFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-55 * page 1, paragraph 15 * * page 3, paragraphs 65,66,71-75 * * page 4, paragraphs 78,85,86 * * page 5; examples 1,2 * * page 7; example 9 * * page 8; example 13 *; | [X]US2004037874 (HONG KEELUNG [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 3, paragraphs 31-33,37,38 * * page 5, paragraphs 48,49 * * page 6, paragraph 59 * * page 15; table 2 * * page 20, paragraph 156; example 21 *; | [X]WO2004053118 (PROTECH RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 2, lines 24-29 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 28 * * page 8, lines 6-11 * * page 21 - page 22; example 5 * * page 23; table . *; | [PXL]WO2006048329 (NOVOSOM AG [DE], et al) [PXL] 1-55 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 4, line 17 - page 9, line 4 * * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 27 * * page 21, lines 1-11; tables 1,2 * * claim 25 *; | [PX]WO2006053646 (NOVOSOM AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-49 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 5 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 21 * * page 6, line 5 - page 10, line 12 * * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 29 * * page 13, lines 18-26 * * page 21 - page 23; examples 5-7 * * claims 24-29 *; | [X] - HAFEZ I M ET AL, "On the mechanism whereby cationic lipids promote intracellular delivery of polynucleic acids", GENE THERAPY, (2001), vol. 8, pages 1188 - 1196, XP002358998 [X] 1-12,14-17,23-39,41-46 * abstract * * page 1189, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1190, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1194, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301506 | [X] - WROBEL I ET AL, "FUSION OF CATIONIC LIPOSOMES WITH MAMMALIAN CELLS OCCURS AFTER ENDOCYTOSIS", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. BIOMEMBRANES, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950504), vol. 1235, no. 2, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 296 - 304, XP000619562 [X] 1-11,14-17,23-39,41-46 * abstract * * page 296, column R, paragraph L - page 297, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 298, column R, paragraph 2 - page 299, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 303, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2736(95)80017-A | [X] - STAMATATOS L ET AL, "INTERACTIONS OF CATIONIC LIPID VESICLES WITH NEGATIVELY CHARGED PHOSPHOLIPID VESICLES AND BIOLOGICAL MEMBRANES", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, PA, US, (19880531), vol. 27, no. 11, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 3917 - 3925, XP000601444 [X] 1-4,6-11,14-17,23-25,43-46 * abstract * * page 3919, column L, paragraph L - page 3919, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 3920, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 3921, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3922; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00411a005 |