EP1785053 - Band for a watchcase and watchcase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/20] | Elongate band for a wristwatch | ||
[2013/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wing Hon Metal Manufactory Ltd. Units A & B, 10/F, Block No. 1, Wah Fung Industrial Centre, 33-39 Kwai Fung Crescent Kwai Chung New Territories / HK | [2013/41] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Wing Hon Metal Manufactory Ltd. Units A & B, 10/F, Block No. 1, Wah Fung Industrial Centre, 33-39 Kwai Fung Crescent Kwai Chung New Territories / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
So, Chin Hung Eddy Wah Fung Ind.Centre UnitsA&B, 10 F, Block 1 33-39 Kwai Fung Crescent Kwai Chung, New Territories Hong Kong / HK | 02 /
So, Chin Ping Wah Fung Ind.Centre UnitsA&B, 10 F, Block 1 33-39 Kwai Fung Crescent Kwai Chung, New Territories Hong Kong / HK | [2013/41] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
So, Chin Hung Eddy Wah Fung Ind.Centre UnitsA&B, 10 F, Block 1 33-39 Kwai Fung Crescent Kwai Chung, New Territories Hong Kong / HK | ||
02 /
So, Chin Ping Wah Fung Ind.Centre UnitsA&B, 10 F, Block 1 33-39 Kwai Fung Crescent Kwai Chung, New Territories Hong Kong / HK | Representative(s) | Russell, Iain Matthew, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2012/17] |
Former [2012/05] | Brewster, Andrea Ruth, et al Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, BS27 3AH / GB | ||
Former [2011/52] | Brewster, Andrea Ruth, et al Greaves Brewster LLP Indigo House Cheddar Business Park Wedmore Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2011/38] | Hall, Graeme Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Hall, Graeme Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester, M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Hall, Graeme Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 5th Floor 14 South Parade Leeds LS1 5QS / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Howe, Steven Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/20] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC2A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06254855.7 | 19.09.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | GB20050022984 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: GB 0522984 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1785053 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1785053 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/14, A44C15/00, A44C5/10 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
A44C5/107 (EP);
A44C5/08 (GB);
A44C5/102 (US);
A44C15/0025 (EP,US);
A44C5/14 (EP,US);
Y10T24/47 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4718 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | A44C5/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2008/04] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Band für ein Uhrengehäuse und Uhrengehäuse | [2013/18] | English: | Band for a watchcase and watchcase | [2013/18] | French: | Bracelet pour un boîtrie de montre et boîtrie de montre | [2013/18] |
Former [2007/20] | Verstrecktes Band für eine Armbanduhr | ||
Former [2007/20] | Elongate band for a wristwatch | ||
Former [2007/20] | Bracelet allongé pour une montre | Examination procedure | 16.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 17.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3036353 (MINUTOLI ANTHONY L); | [X]DE9203248U ; | [X]GB2264628 (FLEXICO COMP LTD [HK]); | [X]GB2297236 (DAILYWIN WATCH PRODUCTS MFG LT [HK]); | [X]WO0132045 (TIMEX CORP [US]); | [X]JP2002233405 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | WO0132045 |