EP1772596 - Method of retrofitting a compressor with non-uniform blade counts of stator vanes in the upper and lower compressor casing halves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | Non-uniform stator vane spacing in a compressor and methods of installation | ||
[2013/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2014/12] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gautreau, James C. 1101 Roper Mountain Road 163 Greenville SC 29615 / US | 02 /
Wassynger, Stephen P. 200 River Walk Blvd., Simpsonville South Carolina 29681 / US | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Gautreau, James C. 1 Woodfern Circle, Greenville South Carolina 29615 / US | ||
02 /
Wassynger, Stephen P. 200 River Walk Blvd., Simpsonville South Carolina 29681 / US | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/15] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255117.1 | 04.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | US20050244372 | 06.10.2005 Original published format: US 244372 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772596 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772596 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772596 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F04D29/66 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
F04D29/667 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F04D29/542 (EP,US);
F04D29/666 (EP,US);
F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
F05D2260/961 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49236 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49238 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49318 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49321 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4973 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49732 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | F01D9/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2013/28] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kompressornachrüstungsverfahren mit ungleichförmiger Leitschaufelanzahl in der oberen und unteren Kompressorgehäusehälfte | [2013/45] | English: | Method of retrofitting a compressor with non-uniform blade counts of stator vanes in the upper and lower compressor casing halves | [2013/43] | French: | Méthode de rétrofit d'un compresseur avec un nombre non uniforme d'aubes statoriques dans les moitiés inférieure et supérieure du carter compresseur | [2013/43] |
Former [2007/15] | Ungleichförmiger Abstand zwischen Leitschaufeln eines Kompressors und Einbaumethoden | ||
Former [2007/15] | Non-uniform stator vane spacing in a compressor and methods of installation | ||
Former [2007/15] | Espace non uniforme entre aubes statoriques d'un compresseur et méthodes d'installation | Examination procedure | 21.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 29.05.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.03.2014 | [2015/18] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1534721 (FRITZ LASCHE) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, line 68 - line 95 * * page 2, line 33 - line 38; figure 3 *; | [A]GB777955 (RUSTON & HORNSBY LTD) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 48 - page 2, line 89; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US5104288 (GROENENDAAL JR JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 7, line 9 - line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]US5639212 (SCHAEFER ROBERT ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 8 - column 5, line 9; figures 1-2 *; | [A]WO9813585 (CHROMALLOY GAS TURBINE CORP [US]) [A] 1-7* page 1 - page 2; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US5984633 (BACHINGER WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 19 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2003012645 (DONNARUMA ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * |