EP1865377 - Method of manufacturing high sag micro-lens and high sag micro-lens manufactured thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan-3-dong, Youngtong-ku Suwon, Kyungki-do / KR | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Chang Hyun 1236-5 Maetan-3-dong Youngtong-ku Suwon Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Seog Moon 102-2302 Woosung Apt. Bongchun-6-dong Kwanak-ku Seoul / KR | 03 /
Lee, Sung Jun 152-3 Anamdong-2ga Sungbook-ku Seoul / KR | 04 /
Jeung, Won Kyu 102-1506 Chunggoo Apt Jamwon-dong Seocho-ku Seoul / KR | 05 /
Park, Ji Hyum 119-1102 Daelim Apt Haengdang-2-dong Sungdong-ku Seoul / KR | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255323.5 | 16.10.2006 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | KR20050097143 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050097143 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1865377 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1865377 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G02B3/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
G02B3/0056 (EP,US);
G02B19/0014 (EP,US);
G02B19/0066 (EP,US);
G02B19/0095 (EP,US);
G02B27/0961 (EP,US);
G02B3/0018 (EP,US);
G03F7/0005 (EP,US);
G03F7/0017 (EP,US);
G03F7/162 (EP,US);
G03F7/36 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | Mikrolinse mit hohem Formfaktor sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | [2007/50] | English: | Method of manufacturing high sag micro-lens and high sag micro-lens manufactured thereby | [2007/50] | French: | Microlentille à rapport de côté élevé et méthode pour la fabriquer | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5230990 (IWASAKI TAKEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * column 9, line 27 - column 11, line 47; figures 6-8 * * column 11, lines 61-67 * [Y] 2,3; | [A]US6200491 (ZESCH JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 26-30 * * figure 3B * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 2 * * column 6, lines 65-67 *; | [A]US2002045028 (TESHIMA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* figures 1,2 *; | [Y] - VETTIGER P ET AL, "High-aspect-ratio, ultrathick, negative-tone near-UV photoresist and its applications for MEMS", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (199801), vol. 64, no. 1, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 33 - 39, XP004102135 [Y] 2,3 * page 34, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(98)80055-1 |