EP1777731 - Corrosion resistant multilayer member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Hajime, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tsukatani, Toshihiko, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Maeda, Takao, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Nash, David Allan HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255418.3 | 20.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | JP20050307199 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005307199 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777731 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777731 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C23C16/44 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
C23C4/18 (EP,US);
B29C43/18 (KR);
B29C43/20 (KR);
B32B27/00 (KR);
C23C24/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/02 (EP,US);
C23C4/11 (EP,US);
C23C4/134 (EP,US);
H01J37/32477 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Korrosionsbeständiges mehrschichtiges Bauteil | [2007/17] | English: | Corrosion resistant multilayer member | [2007/17] | French: | Elément multicouche résistant à la corrosion | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004053081 (SAKURAI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0128] * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2005037193 (SUN JENNIFER Y [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0075] * * claim 27 *; | [A]US2003181065 (O'DONNELL ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0088] * * claim - *; | [A]EP1013623 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021] *; | [A]JPH1045461 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |