EP1779888 - Dynamic hermetic barrier for use with implantable infusion pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codman Neuro Sciences Sarl Chemin-Blanc 36 2400 Le Locle / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Codman Neuro Sciences Sarl Chemin-Blank 36 2400 Le Locle / CH | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Codman & Shurtleff, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham Massachusetts 02767 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bork, Toralf Rue de la Cote 125 2000 Neuchatel / CH | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255487.8 | 25.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US20050259413 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: US 259413 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779888 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/22, A61M5/168, F16K41/10, F16K1/00, F16K41/12 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A61M39/22 (EP,US);
A61M5/16881 (EP,US);
F16K1/34 (EP,US);
F16K31/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Dynamische hermetische Barriere zur Verwendung mit implantierbaren Infusionspumpen | [2007/18] | English: | Dynamic hermetic barrier for use with implantable infusion pumps | [2007/18] | French: | Barrière dynamique hermétique pour l'utilisation avec des pompes à infusion implantables | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.12.2009 | 16.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/18] | 10.01.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2187821 (MANISA ESTABLISHMENT) [X] 18-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US5725017 (ELSBERRY DENNIS D [US], et al) [X] 18-20 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]WO9938551 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-20* figures 3A,3B *; | [X]EP1582232 (CODMAN NEURO SCIENCES SARL [CH]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * |