EP1788437 - Rework process for photoresist film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Shinetsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogihara, Tsutomu c/o Shin Etsu Chemicals Co., Ltd 28-1, NIshi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Jyoetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Ueda, Takafumi c/o Shin Etsu Chemicals Co., Ltd 28-1, NIshi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Jyoetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Craig Richard Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Thomson, Craig Richard Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255764.0 | 09.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | JP20050335518 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005335518 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1788437 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1788437 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1788437 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/09, G03F7/40, G03F7/42 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
G03F7/0752 (EP,US);
G03F7/11 (KR);
G03F7/00 (KR);
G03F7/091 (EP,US);
G03F7/168 (EP,US);
G03F7/26 (KR);
G03F7/422 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/21] | G03F7/09 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/31] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nachbearbeitungsverfahren für Photoresistfilm | [2007/21] | English: | Rework process for photoresist film | [2007/21] | French: | Procédé de remaniement d'une couche de photoréserve | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 27.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005112383 (TANAKA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 2, paragraph 24 * * page 6, paragraph 81 * * claims 1,11 *; | [A]WO2004027518 (ARCH SPEC CHEM INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-68 *; | [A]EP0494744 (NCR CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP1160843 (SEMICONDUCTOR 300 GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-13 * | by applicant | US2005112383 | WO2004027518 | - J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL., (197911), vol. 16, no. 6 |