EP1787682 - Process for inhibiting dyed hair fibers from losing their color during shampooing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states L'Oreal 14 Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Nghi Van 8 Churchill Road Edison, NJ 08820 / US | 02 /
Cannell, David W. 1314 Highland Avenue Plainfield, NJ 07060 / US | 03 /
Espino, Cynthia Chong 15 Health Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
Barger, Katherine Natalie 29 Alden Street 3G Cranford, NJ 07016 / US | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | McCluskie, Gail Wilson J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255835.8 | 15.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | US20050280371 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: US 280371 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787682 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61K8/64, A61K8/73, A61K8/84, A61K8/89 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/736 (EP,US);
A61K8/817 (EP,US);
A61K8/84 (EP,US);
A61K8/896 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung der Abschwächung der Haarfärbung während des Haarwaschens | [2007/21] | English: | Process for inhibiting dyed hair fibers from losing their color during shampooing | [2007/21] | French: | Procédé pour éviter la décoloration des cheveux teints lors du lavage | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1402881 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph 1; examples 1-8; claims 1,24 * * page 3, paragraph 10 - page 4, paragraph 17 * * page 4, paragraph 21 * * page 7, paragraph 45 *; | [Y]DE19735865 (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 14 - line 19 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]US6685926 (HEHNER URSULA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 8 - line 37 * * column 1, line 54 - line 59 *; | [Y]EP1312341 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 9 *; | [A]EP1302195 (MANDOM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * example 4; table 1 * * examples 6-31 *; | [E]EP1733717 (OREAL [FR]) [E] 1-11 * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0025] * * example 4 * * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] , [0080] , [0081] , [0084] *; | [A]EP1238648 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * examples 1,2 *; | [A]WO9325179 (ALBERTO CULVER CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * examples I,III,IV * |