EP1791121 - Information processing apparatus and method, and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/22] | Information processing apparatus and method, information recording medium, and computer program | ||
[2018/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2019/01] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takashima, Yoshikazu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2019/01] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
Takashima, Yoshikazu, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/22] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255956.2 | 21.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | JP20050340823 | 25.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005340823 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1791121 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1791121 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791121 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G11B27/11, G11B27/32 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F12/14 (KR);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00427 (EP,US);
G11B20/00492 (EP,US);
G11B20/00695 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (KR);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/22] | G11B20/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Informationsverarbeitung, und Computerprogramm | [2018/30] | English: | Information processing apparatus and method, and computer program | [2018/30] | French: | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'informations, et programme informatique | [2018/30] |
Former [2007/22] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Informationsverarbeitung, Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium und Computerprogramm | ||
Former [2007/22] | Information processing apparatus and method, information recording medium, and computer program | ||
Former [2007/22] | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'informations, support d'enregistrement d'informations et programme informatique | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12150184.5 / EP2439739 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2006 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0984346 (HITACHI EUROP LTD [GB]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0012] , [0040] - [0046]; figures 1,6,13 *; | [PX]WO2006051037 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [PX] 1-21* the whole document * | Examination | WO0059225 | WO2004114303 | WO2005052941 | WO2005074187 | EP1688950 | EP1710950 | - "ADVANCED ACCESS CONTENT SYSTEM (AACS) REVISION 0.90", INTERNET CITATION, (20050414), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20051109121830/www.aacsla.com/specifications/AACS_Spec-Prerecorded_Video_0.90.pdf, (20071204), XP002461017 | by applicant | EP0984346 |