EP1815871 - Radiographic contrasting agents and radio-opaque polymeric materials for medical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 NW 60th Avenue Miami Lakes, FL 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Jonathon Z. 12 Briar Hill Court Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256292.1 | 11.12.2006 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | US20050301874 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 301874 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1815871 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1815871 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815871 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/04, C07H13/08, C07H17/02, A61L31/18, A61L31/10, A61L31/14, A61L27/34, A61L27/58, A61L17/06, A61L17/14 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61K49/0438 (EP,US);
A61K49/0442 (EP,US);
A61L17/06 (EP,US);
A61L17/145 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61L31/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/52] | A61K49/00, A61L31/18, A61K49/04 | ||
Former IPC [2007/32] | A61K49/00, A61L31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Röntgenkontrastmittel und strahlenundurchlässige Polymermaterialien für medizinische Geräte | [2007/32] | English: | Radiographic contrasting agents and radio-opaque polymeric materials for medical devices | [2007/32] | French: | Agents de contraste radiographiques et matériaux polymères radio-opaques pour les dispositifs médicaux | [2011/44] |
Former [2007/32] | Matériel permettant de favoriser la congélation d'eau ou d'une substance hydratée | Examination procedure | 12.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2006 | AT | 28.03.2012 | BE | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | LU | 11.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
LU | 11.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 28.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0557345 (DIBRA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 1,6; | [Y]US2001031035 (SALB JESSE [US], et al) [Y] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1702628 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [PX] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X] - DAVY K.W.M. AND ANSEAU M.R., "X-ray opaque methacrylate polymers for biomedical applications", POLYMER INTERNATIONAL, (1997), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 143 - 154, XP002458746 [X] 8-20 * the whole document * | [X] - OKAMURA M. ET AL., "Synthesis and properties of radiopaque polymer hydrogels: polyion complexes of copolymers of acrylamide derivaties having triiodophenyl and carboxyl groups and p-styrene sulfonate and polyallylamine", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR STRUCTURE, (2000), vol. 554, pages 35 - 45, XP002458747 [X] 8-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2860(00)00557-3 | [X] - GINEBRA M.P. ET AL., "Improvement of the mechanical properties of acrylic bone cements by substitution of the radio-opaque agent", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, (1999), vol. 10, pages 733 - 737, XP002458748 [X] 8-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008979207968 | Examination | JP2004231622 | by applicant | WO9208691 | US2001031035 | US6426145 | US6599448 | US6852308 |