EP1801891 - Method for the manufacture of solar cell electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/26] | Paste for solar cell electrodes, method for the manufacture of solar cell electrodes, and the solar cell | ||
[2011/08] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takuya, Konno 3-24-8 Hyogozuka, Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi-ken 321-0138 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Benjamin, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Hoffmann, Benjamin, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/37] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/26] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256527.0 | 21.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | JP20050368858 | 21.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005368858 | US20060639944 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 639944 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801891 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801891 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01B1/02, H01B1/04, H01B1/22, H01B1/24 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01B1/02 (EP,US);
H01B1/16 (KR);
H01L31/0224 (KR);
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/10] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Solarzellenelektroden | [2011/08] | English: | Method for the manufacture of solar cell electrode | [2011/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'électrodes à cellules solaires | [2011/08] |
Former [2007/26] | Klebstoff für Solarzellenelektroden, Verfahren zur Herstellung von Solarzellenelektroden und die Solarzelle | ||
Former [2007/26] | Paste for solar cell electrodes, method for the manufacture of solar cell electrodes, and the solar cell | ||
Former [2007/26] | Pâte pour électrodes à cellules solaires, procédé de fabrication d'électrodes à cellules solaires, et cellules solaires | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11000097.3 / EP2306522 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2012
05.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Heraeus Precious Metals GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Martin Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstraße 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2012
Heraeus Precious Metals GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Martin Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | 12.07.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.01.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2013 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2013 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.06.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/50] | 03.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.07.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | [2014/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004214016 (ADACHI FUMIYA [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] - [0022] - [0049]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5; | [X]EP0474879 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 11 * * column 9, line 24 - column 16, line 50; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US4256513 (YOSHIDA MANABU, et al) [Y] 5 * column 6, line 27 - column 15, line 6; figures 1a-1c * | Examination | EP1713095 | EP1713091 | EP1713092 | by applicant | JP2005243500 |