EP1803395 - Magnetic stabilization of catheter location sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grunewald, Debby Esther 1142 West 25th Street Los Angeles, CA 90007 / US | 02 /
Schmidt, Jerry Author 14 Sagitta Way Coto de Caza, CA 92679 / US | 03 /
Pendekanti, Rajesh 15168 Calle Verano Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
Grunewald, Debby Esther 1142 West 25th Street Los Angeles, CA 90007 / US | ||
02 /
Schmidt, Jerry Author 14 Sagitta Way Coto de Gaza, CA 92679 / US | |||
03 /
Pendekanti, Rajesh 15168 Calle Verano Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256631.0 | 29.12.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | US20050322594 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: US 322594 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1803395 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803395 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | Magnetische Stabilisierung eines Kartierungskatheters | [2007/27] | English: | Magnetic stabilization of catheter location sensor | [2007/27] | French: | Stabilisation magnétique d'un cathéter de cartographie | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2011 | BE | 26.01.2011 | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IT | 26.01.2011 | LT | 26.01.2011 | LV | 26.01.2011 | PL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | ES | 07.05.2011 | IS | 26.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 26.01.2011 | |
BE | 26.01.2011 | ||
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 26.01.2011 | |
CY | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 26.01.2011 | |
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0121069 (STEREOTAXIS INC [US]) [X] 1-9* page 7 - page 8; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO0121069 |