EP1803407 - Ablation catheter with improved tip cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Datta, Keshava 2445 E. Del Mar Blvd., Apt. 446 Pasadena, CA 91107 / US | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256632.8 | 29.12.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | US20050322583 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: US 322583 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1803407 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803407 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00029 (EP,US);
A61B2218/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/27] | A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | Ablationskatheter mit verbessertem Abkühlen der Spitze | [2007/27] | English: | Ablation catheter with improved tip cooling | [2007/27] | French: | Cathéter d'ablation avec rafraîchissement de pointe amélioré | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | LU | 29.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
LU | 29.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10030111 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [A] 2-7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0029] - [0031] *; | [A]US2002198520 (COEN THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 2-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0037] *; | [A]US2004231683 (ENG MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0015] , [0016] *; | [A]WO2005112814 (BARD INC C R [US], et al) [A] 2-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 4 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 6 * | by applicant | WO2005012814 |