EP1681411 - Lock cylinder for key having a key bit which cross section is non-circular [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENY FONTAINE Route de Saint Valéry 80960 Saint-Blimont / FR | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupre Philippe 14 rue du 22ème RIC 80132 Villers-sur-Mareuil / FR | 02 /
Barge Eric 22, rue Alexandre Papin 76740 Le Tréport / FR | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/29] | Bertrand, Didier c/o S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290050.1 | 09.01.2006 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | FR20050000321 | 12.01.2005 Original published format: FR 0500321 | [2006/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681411 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1681411 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05B15/06 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
E05B15/06 (EP);
E05B19/0047 (EP);
E05B21/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Title | German: | Schlosszylinder für Schlüssel mit nicht kreisförmigem Querschnitt | [2006/29] | English: | Lock cylinder for key having a key bit which cross section is non-circular | [2006/29] | French: | Cylindre de serrure pour clé a tige de section non circulaire | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 27.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | IE | 09.12.2009 | LT | 09.12.2009 | LV | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | LU | 09.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | IS | 09.04.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LU | 09.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE524308 (HERMANN KADE) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 15 - line 113 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE612259 (ARTHUR STADIE) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 17 - line 56 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0376867 (DENY [FR]) [A] 1,10 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2734858 (DENY [FR]) [A] 1,10 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 19 ** figures 1-9 *; | [A]FR2757557 (DENY [FR]) [A] 1,10 * page 5, line 1 - line 10 * * figure 1 * |