EP1811436 - Electronic module suitable for identification documents and method for manufacturing such a module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Axalto SA 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vere, Dénis, c/o Axalto SA Intellectual Property Dept. 50 avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | 02 /
Jean, Xavier, c/o Axalto SA Intellectual Property Dept. 50 avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | 03 /
Borg, Norbert, c/o Axalto SA Intellectual Property Dept. 50 avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Axalto SA Intel Property dpt 6, rue de la Verrière 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290165.7 | 23.01.2006 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1811436 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
G06K19/07779 (EP);
G06K19/04 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/07783 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Modul geeignet für Identifizierungsdokumente und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2007/30] | English: | Electronic module suitable for identification documents and method for manufacturing such a module | [2007/30] | French: | Module électronique adapté à l'identification de documents et procédé de fabrication d'un tel module | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2001236479 ; | [X]JPH11328343 ; | [X]US6407669 (BROWN KATHERINE A [US], et al) [X] 1,8,11 * figures 1-6 *; | [XA]EP1416581 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 8,11 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010412), vol. 2000, no. 25, & JP2001236479 A 20010831 (MIYOTA KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 8,11 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11328343 A 19991130 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |