EP1816790 - Communication interface and testing method therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fossion, Marc Rue Sart Mallet 14 5140 Ligny / BE | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
Fossion, Marc Rue sart Mallet 14 5140 Ligny / BE | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06290195.4 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816790 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816790 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/24, H04M3/30 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
H04M3/302 (EP,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/58 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0188 (EP,US);
H04M3/304 (EP,US);
Y04S40/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Kommunikationsschnittstelle und Prüfverfahren dafür | [2007/32] | English: | Communication interface and testing method therefore | [2007/32] | French: | Interface de communication et procédé d'essais correspondant | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 25.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | BE | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IT | 23.04.2008 | LT | 23.04.2008 | LV | 23.04.2008 | NL | 23.04.2008 | PL | 23.04.2008 | RO | 23.04.2008 | SI | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | DE | 24.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | ES | 03.08.2008 | IS | 23.08.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | HU | 24.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DE | 24.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 23.04.2008 | |
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 23.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6507199 (AHRNDT THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12,16,17 * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 5-9,13-15; | [A]US2005025061 (PEDERSEN STEEN [DK], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract ** paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * |