EP1705314 - Shelter with support structure made from profiled elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abrisud ZI du Pont Peyrin 32600 L'Isle Jourdain / FR | [2007/29] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Aqua Developpement Rue Joseph Arnal 60510 Bresles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Driant, Yoann 174 rue du Colonel Fabien 60940 Angicourt / FR | 02 /
Wystup, Frédéric 83 rue Pierre Butin 95300 Pontoise / FR | 03 /
Wystup, Jean-Pierre 4 rue du Clos 60930 Bailleul sur Therain / FR | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François, et al Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Richebourg, Michel François, et al Cabinet Michel Richebourg Le Clos du Golf 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | ||
Former [2007/29] | Thurgood, Alexander John, et al Cabinet Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | ||
Former [2006/39] | Burbaud, Eric Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290465.1 | 22.03.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | FR20050002842 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: FR 0502842 | [2006/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1705314 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1705314 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/16 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
E04H3/165 (EP);
E04B2001/3276 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | E04H3/16, E04H4/08 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/11] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Unterstand mit einer Tragestruktur aus Profilelementen | [2006/39] | English: | Shelter with support structure made from profiled elements | [2006/39] | French: | Abri à structure de profiles | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 24.04.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.2011 | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4100704 (OOGAMI EIRYO) [A] 1 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 15; figure 3 *; | [A]US4724646 (MEYERS LEO J [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 30; figure 9 *; | [A]US5568707 (ISHIKAWA MASAYOSHI [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6604327 (REVILLE JIM [US]) [AD] 5,6 * figures 1-7 * |