EP1707647 - Bearing with reinforced ring comprising a cage with deflector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.N.R. ROULEMENTS 1, rue des Usines 74000 Annecy / FR | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lornage, Sandrine 14 Place du Forez F-42160 Andrezieux Boutheon / FR | 02 /
Lonchambon, Hervé Les Granges F-74540 Gruffy / FR | 03 /
Simon, Thibault 4 rue des Edelweiss F-74000 Annecy / FR | 04 /
Mermoud, Gérard 2 Impasse du Bosquet F-74330 La Balme de Sillingy / FR | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/40] | Breese, Pierre BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290530.2 | 03.04.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | FR20050003251 | 01.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0503251 | [2006/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1707647 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707647 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/32, F16C33/64, F16C33/41, F16C33/38, C21D9/40 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
F16C33/7893 (EP);
C21D9/40 (EP);
C23C8/32 (EP);
C23C8/80 (EP);
F16C33/3875 (EP);
F16C33/416 (EP);
F16C33/62 (EP);
F16C33/64 (EP);
C21D6/04 (EP);
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C2202/04 (EP);
F16C2204/66 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | Lager mit Verstärktem Ring und Käfig mit Deflektor | [2006/40] | English: | Bearing with reinforced ring comprising a cage with deflector | [2006/40] | French: | Roulements à bague renforcée comprenant une cage pourvue d'un déflecteur | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.12.2008
ADMISSIBLE SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 D-97421 Schweinfurt / DE Opponent's representative Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.12.2008
ADMISSIBLE SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 D-97421 Schweinfurt / DE Opponent's representative Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH, Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | 20.01.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.09.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.07.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.09.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/05] | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.09.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2008 | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IE | 12.03.2008 | IT | 12.03.2008 | LT | 12.03.2008 | LV | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | PL | 12.03.2008 | RO | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | LU | 03.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | ES | 23.06.2008 | IS | 12.07.2008 | PT | 14.08.2008 | HU | 13.09.2008 | GB | 03.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/03] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
LU | 03.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
GR | 13.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
LU | 03.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
LU | 03.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CY | 12.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FR | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
LV | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0626468 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL]) [Y] 1-3,5-9,12-18 * the whole document *; | [YD]FR2787530 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [YD] 1-3,5-9,12-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US6423158 (MAEDA KIKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,8,9 * claims 1,4,8 *; | [A]US6592684 (YAMAMURA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,8,9* the whole document *; | [A]EP1355071 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,8,9 * the whole document * |