EP1843614 - Method of performing a handover in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strauss, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Jurastrasse 61 73734 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Wahl, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. Stettiner Strasse 8 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 03 /
Tomsu, Marco, Dipl.-Ing. Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 12 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06290570.8 | 05.04.2006 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843614 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843614 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W36/14 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H04L65/1043 (EP);
H04L65/1083 (EP);
H04L65/1095 (EP);
H04W36/144 (EP);
H04W60/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/41] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Weiterreichungsverfahren in einem Mobilkommunikationssystem | [2007/41] | English: | Method of performing a handover in a mobile communication system | [2007/41] | French: | Procédé de transfert d'appel dans un système de communication mobile | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2011 | BE | 02.03.2011 | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IT | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | NL | 02.03.2011 | PL | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | IE | 05.04.2011 | LU | 05.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 05.04.2011 | ||
LU | 05.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 05.04.2011 | ||
LU | 05.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 05.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 05.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.03.2011 | |
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02103951 (FLARION TECNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * page 2, line 8 - page 5, line 8 * * page 13, line 9 - page 18, line 6 *; | [A]WO2005027563 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006011730 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,6-10* page 2, line 35 - page 14, line 3; figure - * |